Bussey et al v. Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Graham, Patricia Wilborn, Walter Bussey, Dollie Williams, Maudie Green, David M. Palmer, II and Robin Paige
Defendant: Milton E. McGregor, Multimedia Games, Inc., IGT, Cadillac Jack, Inc., Colossus, Inc., Rocket Gaming Systems, LLC, Nova Gaming, LLC, Bally Gaming, Inc. and Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00191
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2012 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 214 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/4/2012. (dmn, )
August 31, 2012 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Patricia Wilborn's 215 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Her Claims Against Defendants, and pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and that all claims brought by Plaintiff Wilborn are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/31/2012. (dmn, )
March 31, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the motions to dismiss, filed by Defendants Cadillac Jack, Inc. (Doc. 74 ), IGT (Doc. 75 ), Macon County Greyhound Park and Milton E. McGregor (Doc. 76 ), Multimedia Games, Inc. (Doc. 77 ), Bally Gaming , Inc. (Doc. 82 ), and Nova Gaming, LLC (Doc. 83 ) are DENIED; further ORDERED that the Miami Tribe of Oklahoma Business Development Authority's 86 motion to dismiss based upon sovereign immunity is DENIED without prejudice, with leave to renew under Rule 12(b)(1), if and when appropriate, as further set out. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/31/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussey et al v. Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Graham
Represented By: Walter Britt Calton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Wilborn
Represented By: Walter Britt Calton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Bussey
Represented By: Walter Britt Calton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dollie Williams
Represented By: Walter Britt Calton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maudie Green
Represented By: Walter Britt Calton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Palmer, II
Represented By: Walter Britt Calton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Paige
Represented By: Walter Britt Calton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton E. McGregor
Represented By: John Merrill Bolton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multimedia Games, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Conrad Anderson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGT
Represented By: Tabor Robert Novak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadillac Jack, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchel Hampton Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colossus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocket Gaming Systems, LLC
Represented By: Oscar M Price, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Gaming, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bally Gaming, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc.
Represented By: John Merrill Bolton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?