Farris v. Forniss et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Perry Farris
Defendant: Leon Forniss and Troy King
Case Number: 3:2010cv00270
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner's 14 Motion requesting the court to reconsider its order denying his request to expedite disposition of the instant petition is DENIED based on the reasons stated in 13 Order; that the court notes that this matter is ready for review and a decision shall be rendered within due course as the court's schedule permits. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/23/2011. (cc, )
June 15, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION that Petitioner's 12 Motion to Amend Habeas Petition and 12 Motion for Evidentiary Ruling is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/15/2011. (dmn)
April 21, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner shall show cause why his 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should not be denied as it was not filed within the one-year limitation period established by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1). Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2010. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/21/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farris v. Forniss et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Forniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?