Short v. Mando American Corporation

Plaintiff: Claude R. Short
Defendant: Mando American Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv00350
Filed: April 22, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant's Motions to Quash (Doc. 104 and 105 ) are DENIED as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/16/2011. (dmn)
August 1, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Short's 49 Motion for a Protective Order and Motion to Strike MAC's motion for summary judgment is DENIED; 2. MAC's 59 Motion to strike portions of Short's evidentiar y submission submitted in opposition to MAC's motion for summary judgment is DENIED as MOOT; 3. Short's 63 Motion to strike Rolison's affidavit is DENIED as MOOT; 4. Short's 64 Motion to Strike Kwak's affidavit is DENIED as MOOT; and 5. MAC's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Short's § 1981 race discrimination claims regarding his demotion in December of 2008 andGRANTED in all other respects. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (dmn)
February 7, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/7/2011. (dmn)
November 4, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. It is granted to the extent it seeks an extension of the deadline in the 11 Uniform SchedulingOrder, for the filing any motions to amend the pleadings. T he plaintiff shall file any such motion to amend the pleadings on or before November 25, 2010. The motion is DENIED with respect to all other deadlines contained in the Uniform Scheduling Order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/4/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. Mando American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude R. Short
Represented By: Alicia Kay Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mando American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?