Newsome v. Kwangsung America, Corp.

Plaintiff: Charles Newsome
Defendant: Kwangsung America, Corp.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00548
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Tallapoosa
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 77 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/22/2011. (br, )
September 16, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sustaining the defendant's objections as to Exhibits ## 10, 25, 28, 29, 30, 35, 36, 39, and 40 of the Plaintiff's 69 Amended Exhibit List. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/16/2011. (br, )
September 13, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sustaining the 51 Objections to Plaintiffs Witness and Exhibit Lists. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/13/2011. (br, )
September 12, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 42 MOTION in Limine to the extent that the Defendant may present evidence about the circumstances of John Kim's termination and may refer to John Kim's termination in opening statement. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/12/2011. (br, )
September 8, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony/Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Purported Four Year Oral Employment Agreement; denying 46 Motion in Limine to Exclude Damages Evidence. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/8/2011. (br, )
September 7, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion in Limine to Exclude Any Witnesses, Argument, or Line of Questioning by Defendant that Other Employees Were Terminated for Similar Reasons. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/7/2011. (br, )
August 19, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that in any motion in limine filed by the Defendant on the issue of back pay, the Defendant should address application of case law further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/19/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsome v. Kwangsung America, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Newsome
Represented By: Joshua David Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwangsung America, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?