Butler v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Demitria Butler
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc. and Protection One Systems
Case Number: 3:2010cv00828
Filed: September 29, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Macon
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring all future filings from plaintiff to be filed on or before 5:00 p.m. of the deadline date; extending the deadline to 10/14/2011 for Charter to file a reply to the response to the motion for summary judgment; directing Plaintiff's counsel to advise Charter's counsel re: where Erick Butler can be served with a deposition subpoena; extending the discovery deadline to 10/14/2011 for the sole purpose of allowing Defendant Charter to depose Erick Butler within the time allowed; holding in abeyance 86 MOTION to Strike 85 Affidavit of Erick Butler pending compliance with this order; and denying the 86 Motions to Strike in all other respects. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/29/2011. (br, )
September 14, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Opposition; Reply Brief deadline extended to 9/20/2011. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/14/2011. (br, )
June 3, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/3/2011. (wcl, )
March 17, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss; the motion is GRANTED as to Butler's wantonness claim and DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/17/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demitria Butler
Represented By: Fred Jr. David Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Barry William Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protection One Systems
Represented By: Ray A Carle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?