Sides et al v. Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc.

Plaintiff: Myra Sides, Judy Weekes-Walker, Mona Thomas, Keyla Exford, Ritchie L. Stalnaker and Sharon Cobb
Defendant: Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00895
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Tallapoosa
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING A HEARING ON DAMAGES as follows: (1) a Hearing is set for 5/28/2014 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller, in Courtroom 2A, US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL, as further set out in order; (2) Plaintiffs shall file a brief a nd any evidentiary materials on the issue ofstatutory damages on or before May 7, 2014; (3) Defendant shall file a brief and any evidentiary materials on the issue ofstatutory damages on or before May 21, 2014; (4) Plaintiffs are further ordered to f ile a separate motion for attorneys fees withsupporting evidentiary materials on or before May 7, 2014; (5) Defendant may file a brief and any evidentiary materials in opposition toPlaintiffs; motion for attorneys' fees on or before May 21, 2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/3/14. Furnished to calendar group & WR.
October 25, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the parties submit a joint status report on or before 11/8/2013 on the following issues: (1) whether the parties dispute that the expected length of time of the January layoffs was six months or less, or more than six months; (2) if the parties dispute the expected length of time of the January layoffs, what discovery will the parties need to conduct to address the issue in a hearing before the Court, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/25/13. (djy, )
September 19, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 119 MOTION to Stay and this cause of action is STAYED pending resolution of the present appeal before the Eleventh Circuit. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/19/12. (djy, )
June 11, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion to Quash, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/11/12. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sides et al v. Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Sides
Represented By: Philip Dale Segrest, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Weekes-Walker
Represented By: Philip Dale Segrest, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Thomas
Represented By: Philip Dale Segrest, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyla Exford
Represented By: Philip Dale Segrest, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritchie L. Stalnaker
Represented By: Philip Dale Segrest, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Cobb
Represented By: Philip Dale Segrest, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon County Greyhound Park, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?