Bureaus Investment Group #1, LLC v. Stewart

Plaintiff: Bureaus Investment Group #1, LLC
Defendant: Allie J. Stewart
Case Number: 3:2010cv01019
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Macon
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2016 254 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the 245 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under 28 U.S.C. 1927 is DENIED; further ORDERING that plf's 247 request for briefing schedule is DENIED as moot, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/30/16. (djy, )
July 1, 2015 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Defendants Mark Chambless and Chambless Math & Carr, P.C.'s motion to dismiss (Doc. # 191 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: the motion is GRANTED as to Counts I, III, and V, which are DISMISSED with prejudice; the motion is DENIED with respect to Count IV. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on July 1, 2015. (scn, )
June 2, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1) Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. # 140 ) is DENIED with leave to refile under circumstances identified in this opinion; (2) Ms. Stewart's motion for leave to file a third amended complain t (Doc. # 14 2) is DENIED to the extent that Ms. Stewart may not file a third amended complaint as it is currently drafted; (3) Ms. Stewart is GRANTED leave to file, on or before June 13, 2014, another motion to amend the complaint with a proposed third amended complaint that comports with the findings in this opinion, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/2/14. (scn, )
March 1, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the 17 Motion to Amend Complaint; on or before March 15, 2012, Ms. Stewart shall file an amended complaint that complies with Local Rule 15.1; further ORDERED that the 16 Uniform Scheduling Order is VACATED, and the parties are DIRECTED to file an amended Rule 26(f) report on or before March 22, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/1/12. (scn, ) Modified on 3/1/2012 to notate that 31 Entry has been furnished to Calendar and AR via CM/ECF. Term'd: Final PTC 5/17/2012 and Jury Trial 06/18/2012 (scn, ).
June 10, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the 6 Motion to Remand and 6 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/10/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bureaus Investment Group #1, LLC v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bureaus Investment Group #1, LLC
Represented By: Mark Norman Chambless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allie J. Stewart
Represented By: Charles Jerry Lorant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?