McKeithen v. Jackson et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Orlando Samuel McKeithen
Defendant: Linda Brown, Cathy Jackson and Juanice Cole
Case Number: 3:2011cv00190
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Tallapoosa
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 57 be and is hereby ADOPTED, and that this case be and is hereby DISMISSED as stated specifically above. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/6/2014. (jg, )
July 26, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 Answer, Written Report, and supporting evidentiary materials filed by Defendant Brown. ORDERED that on or before 8/16/2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant Brown's answer and written report as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/26/2011. (dmn)
April 19, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court GRANTS the 13 Motion for Leave to Construe the Amended Complaint as a Written Objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, concurs with the Magistrate Judge's denial of the Motion to Amend as to Defendant Carlt on, overrules the objection, and ADOPTS the 9 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. It is ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants Allen and Carlton is DISMISSED with prejudice and prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). 2. Defendants Allen and Carlton are DISMISSED as parties to the Complaint. 3. This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings with regard to the remaining Defendants. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/19/2011. (dmn)
March 21, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $13.11 be paid on or before 4/11/2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 4 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Kilby Correctional Facility as directed. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 3/21/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKeithen v. Jackson et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Samuel McKeithen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanice Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?