Blake v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Susan H. Blake |
Defendant: |
Bank of America, N.A., Best Interest Rate Mortgage Company, LLC and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00242 |
Filed: |
March 31, 2011 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Opelika Office |
County: |
Lee |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark E. Fuller |
Presiding Judge: |
Wallace Capel |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 17, 2013 |
Filing
91
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court as follows: (1) With respect to the sole remaining breach of contract claim asserted by Plaintiff Susan H. Blak e against Defendant Bank of America, N.A., judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. and against Plaintiff Susan H. Blake, with Plaintiff taking nothing by her claim. (2) Costs are TAXED in favor of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. and against Plaintiff Susan H. Blake for which execution may issue. (3) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket sheets of this case as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and to close the file. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/17/2013. (jg, ) TERMINATED: Jury Trial 01/28/2013
|
October 10, 2012 |
Filing
52
ORDER re Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Continue Trial Setting, to which Defendant Bank of America, N.A. ("BANA") has responded in its 44 Response to Order to Show Cause, and Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendant's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Continue Trial Setting is DENIED. Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Extend Deadline, it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff 39;s 46 Response to BANA's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 11/16/2012, and that BANA's reply to Plaintiff's response is due by 11/28/2012. The parties should not expect a ruling on BANA's 46 Motion for Summary Judg ment by the pretrial conference date of 1/3/2013. Additionally, the parties should be aware that this extension of the deadlines may result in the trial of this case being continued beyond the term of court commencing on 1/28/2013 in Opelika, Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/10/2012. (dmn, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?