Thompson v. Reeves et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Defendant: Paul Brunson and Ben C. Reeves, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00288
Filed: April 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Russell
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This cause is now before the Court on Plaintiff's 7 Notice of Appeal, and the 9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. It is CONSIDERED and ORDERED that the Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis be and the same is hereby DENIED; and that the Plaintiff's 7 Notice of Appeal be and the same is hereby CERTIFIED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. § 1915(a), as not taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/15/2011. (dmn)
May 24, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that the 4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice in accordance with the provisions set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 5/24/2011. (br, )
April 18, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Russell County Jail. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/18/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Reeves et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben C. Reeves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?