Canal Indemnity Company v. Regency Club Condominium Owners Association, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Canal Indemnity Company
Defendant: Regency Club, LLC, Park Lane Construction, Inc., Robert G. Randall, G&G Roofing Company, Inc., Paul Nicholson and Regency Club Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Regency Club Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Canal Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00400
Filed: May 26, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 78 Second Motion for Summary Judgment by Canal Indemnity is GRANTED; (2) The 82 Motion for Summary Judgment by Park Lane Construction is DENIED; (3) Canal's pending 112 Request fo r Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Second Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as MOOT; (4) Park Lane's pending 118 Motion for Leave to File Amended Affidavit of L. Bratton Rainey, III, regarding the issue of litigation costs, is DENIED as M OOT; (5) All deadlines, hearings, conferences, and the trial set in this case are CANCELLED; (6) A separate final judgment will be entered consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/7/13. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(Term'd: Final PTC 01/08/2013 and Non Jury Trial 01/28/2013)(scn, )
January 12, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that (1) For good cause shown, Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Extension of Deadline To Perfect Service on G & G Roofing Company, Inc. is GRANTED, as further set out; (2) Service be made by publication on the defendant G & G Roofing Company, Inc.; Counsel for the plaintiff shall prepare a publication, as further set out; Counsel for the plaintiff shall submit this publication to the Clerk of the Court; (3) The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve notice by publication in the Opelika-Aubur n News, a newspaper of general circulation in Lee County, Alabama, and the Tuskegee News, a newspaper of general circulation in Macon County, Alabama. Ala. R. Civ.P. 4.3(d), as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/12/11. (Furnished via CM/ECF to Clerk of Court) (scn, )
November 15, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that PLC's 36 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Assert Counterclaim is hereby GRANTED; PLC is hereby ORDERED to file its amended complaint by November 22, 2011; Canal's answer to PLC's Counterclaim is due on or before December 8, 2011, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/15/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canal Indemnity Company v. Regency Club Condominium Owners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Lane Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Danny Collier, Jr.
Represented By: Lloyd B Rainey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&G Roofing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Club Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Roberts Law
Represented By: David F. Daniell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Regency Club Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: David F. Daniell
Represented By: Jonathan Roberts Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canal Indemnity Company
Represented By: Joseph Edward Bishop Stewart
Represented By: Conley Walden Knott
Represented By: William A Austill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Canal Indemnity Company
Represented By: William A Austill
Represented By: Joseph Edward Bishop Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?