Grady v. Jones, et al (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Larry Jerone Grady
Defendant: Luther Strange and Kenneth Jones
Case Number: 3:2011cv00430
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) Petitioner's objections (Doc. # 68 ) are OVERRULED; (2) The Recommendation (Doc. # 65 ) is ADOPTED; (3) The petition for habeas corpus relief is DENIED; (4) This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/26/14. (scn, )
September 27, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/27/12. (scn, )
August 6, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. Plaintiff's objections 33 are OVERRULED; 2. the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 26 is ADOPTED; 3. Plaintiff's Motion for a temporary restraining order 22 is DENIED; and 4. pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), this case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or other recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/6/2012. (jg, )
July 14, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before August 4, 2011, Grady shall show cause why his federal habeas petition should not be denied as it was not filed within the one-year limitation period established by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1) and for the other reasons asserted by the respondents in their answer, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/14/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady v. Jones, et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Represented By: John Judson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jones
Represented By: John Judson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Jerone Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?