Anthony v. Bulls Realty et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy Anthony
Defendant: Bulls Realty and Utilities Board of Tuskegee
Case Number: 3:2011cv00735
Filed: September 7, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 87 MOTION Enforce Settlement Agreement is set for a Status Conference on 2/19/2013 @ 09:00 AM before Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller, in Courtroom 2A US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; directing that plaintiff Dorothy Anthony AND her counsel of record Lateefah Muhammad are both ORDERED to attend this status conference, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that no defendant is required to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 85 third amended complaint filed on 1/29/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/14/13. Furnished to calendar group & WR.(djy, )
February 11, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the parties file their joint stipulation of dismissal on or before 2/13/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/11/13. (djy, )
November 21, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file with the Court an amended complaint that properly establishes federal subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity; failure to plead the necessary jurisdictional prerequisites by 11/27/2012 will result in dismissal of this case for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/21/12. (djy, )
November 8, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 11/16/2012, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that conforms to the finding of this order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/8/12. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony v. Bulls Realty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulls Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utilities Board of Tuskegee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Anthony
Represented By: Lateefah Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?