Brewster et al v. Southern Home Rentals, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Howard Scott Brewster and Melanie Brewster
Defendant: Southern Home Rentals, LLC, Nationwide Insurance and April Jones
Case Number: 3:2011cv00872
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In a telephone conference today, counsel discussed with the court the scope of testimony of Kathy Willard to be presented by the Plaintiffs at trial. The court expressed that with regard to any opinion as to the cost of future medical expenses, Kathy Willard would only be allowed to express an opinion with an appropriate foundation, which the court would take up outside the presence of the jury as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/7/2012. (jg, )
December 4, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the 51 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Kathy Willard is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiffs are not to refer to Willard's opinions without first taking up their admissibility outside of the presence of the jury as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/4/2012. (dmn, )
December 3, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties file an agreed upon verdict form, or if a single verdict form cannot be agreed to by the parties, two separate verdict forms, on or before December 5, 2012. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/3/2012. (jg, )
November 30, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 52 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger Allen be and is hereby ORDERED DENIED as moot, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/30/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewster et al v. Southern Home Rentals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Scott Brewster
Represented By: Jeff Shiver
Represented By: Alan J Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Brewster
Represented By: Jeff Shiver
Represented By: Alan J Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Home Rentals, LLC
Represented By: John Charles S. Pierce
Represented By: Gabrielle Elaine Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Jones
Represented By: John Charles S. Pierce
Represented By: Gabrielle Elaine Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?