Tatum v. ADT Security Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ethel Tatum
Defendant: ADT Security Services, Inc., Rodney Kennedy, Casey Colvin and Defender Security Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00110
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Macon
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 46 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED to the extent that Count IV is based on allegations of fraudulent representations by Defendants Kennedy and Colvin, in May 2010, in Tuskegee, Macon County, Al abama; (2) The 46 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED to the extent that Count IV is based on allegations of fraud by any unnamed agent of the corporate Defendants, including Fictitious Defendants; (3) Fictitious Defendants A-C and D-F are STRICKEN from the Complaint in this case, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/6/13. (scn, )
April 11, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Permission to Appeal; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292 (b), this court's 22 Memorandum Opinion and Order is AMENDED to add the following certification: This Memorandum Opinion and Order involves a controlling qu estion of law as to which there is substantial ground for difference of opinion and an immediate appeal from this order may materially advance the ultimate termination of this litigation. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/11/12. (scn, )
March 19, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1.) The Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Strike is DENIED; (2.) The Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Remand is DENIED; (3.) The Defendants' 1 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to being refiled under appropriate law, should the Defendants choose to do, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/19/12. (scn, )
March 12, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Defendants shall show cause, if any there be, on or before march 16, 2012, why the 17 Motion to strike should not be granted, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/12/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatum v. ADT Security Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Tatum
Represented By: Richard Keith Thomas
Represented By: John Robert Potter
Represented By: Teddy Lee Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT Security Services, Inc.
Represented By: Blake Lee Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Kennedy
Represented By: Blake Lee Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defender Security Company
Represented By: Blake Lee Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?