Benson v. Samlip Alabama, LLC

Plaintiff: Vonnetta Benson
Defendant: Samlip Alabama, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00379
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Tallapoosa
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge; defendant's 51 and 54 motions to dismiss are GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/24/13. (djy, )
January 10, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: (1) Connie J. Morrow is DIRECTED to pay an attorney fee assessment to the Clerk of Court in the amount of $212.80 by 5:00 P.M. on Friday, January 11, 2013; (2) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send payment of the attorney fee assessment in the amount of $212.80 to Defendant's counsel Scott, Sullivan, Streetman & Fox, P.C., Attention: Joseph Elliott Stott, P.O. Box 380548, Birmingham, Alabama 35238-0548; (3) Connie J. Morrow is DIRECTED to certify to the Court no later than January 11, 2013, that she has paid the fee assessment; as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/10/13. (Furnished to Financial/WR)(scn, )
December 21, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 28 Motion to Amend is DENIED with leave to refile, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/21/12. (scn, )
December 14, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of Plaintiff's counsel Connie J. Morrow's 36 Motion to Re-Schedule 12-20-2012 Telephone Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the motion is granted to the extent that it requests a continuance of the telephonic status conference currently set on Ms. Morrow's 34 Motion to Withdraw; accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the telephonic status conference currently scheduled for December 20, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. is CANCELLED; the 36 Motion to Re-Schedule is denied to the extent that it requests that the motion requests that the Court grant Ms. Morrow's 34 Motion to Withdraw without a hearing; accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Withdraw will be held on January 10, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2A, United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; Plaintiff, Plaintiff's attorney of record, Connie J. Morrow, and counsel for Defendant are ORDERED to appear at said hearing; the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff by certified mail. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/14/12. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(scn, )
November 5, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/3/2012; ORDERED that Plf's 30 Motion to Correct Document 29 and Sub stitute Motion to Postpone Discovery or Extend Response Time is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; It is GRANTED to the extent that this Court construes it as motion to strike Plf's 29 Motion for Extension of Time from the record as a filing error, but DENIED as MOOT to the extent that it requests an extension of time to respond to Dft's discovery requests; directing the Clerk to STRIKE Plf's 29 Motion for Extension of Time from the record, as it was filed in error. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/5/2012. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Samlip Alabama, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samlip Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Elliott Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonnetta Benson
Represented By: Connie J. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?