Todd v. City of LaFayette, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Merrill Todd
Defendant: City of LaFayette, Alabama, Jerome Bailey, Larry Clark, Mike Petrey, Terry Woods and Michael Parrish
Case Number: 3:2012cv00589
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Chambers
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2018 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: it is ORDERED that: (1) The 144 motion to stay pending interlocutory appeal is granted; (2) This case is stayed pending the resolution of the interlocutory appeal; (3) The pretrial and trial dates, and all other deadlines tied to those dates, are continued generally; (4) This case is closed administratively pending appeal. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/11/2018. (furn: calendar, ag) (term: PTC for 08/16/2018; Jury Trial for 09/17/2018) (wcl, )
November 13, 2017 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, in light of the court's backlog, the 113 motion for ruling is granted to the extent that the resolution of this case will be given all priority, with the intent of a ruling on the pending dispositive motions within 30 days. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/13/17. (djy, )
September 23, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that defendant Steve Smith's 51 motion for summary judgement is granted as to the 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claim against him. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/23/13. (scn, )
March 14, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that, by March 28, 2013, plaintiff Merrill Todd shall provide evidence on the following two questions: (1) When did plaintiff Todd first learn defendant Steve Smith's identity? (2) What efforts did plaintiff Todd and his attorney take to discover defendant Smith's identity?. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/14/13. (scn, )
March 12, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that dfts' 70 & 79 Motions to strike are denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/12/2013. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. City of LaFayette, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrill Todd
Represented By: Mark Andrew Overall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of LaFayette, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Petrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?