C.W. et al v. Lindsey
Plaintiff: C.W., Attorney Karen Mastin Laneaux and Mary Amanda Weed
Defendant: Christy Lindsay
Case Number: 3:2013cv00139
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT directing that, in accordance with the opinion entered this date, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The parties' motion for approval of pro-ami settlement (doc. no. #41 ) is granted; (2) The proposed settlement between plaintiff C.W. and defendant Christy Lindsay is approved; (3) Judgment is entered favor of plaintiffs C.W. and Mary Amanda Weed and against defendant Lindsay in the amount of $ 150,000.00, of which $ 80,143 shall be used to purchase a structured annuity contract for plaintiff C.W. under the terms described in Exhibit A (doc. no. #41 -1); (4) Defendant Lindsay's insurance carrier will pay all fees and expenses for guardian ad litem Karen Laneaux; all other costs, expenses, and attorney's fees shall be born by the parties or paid out of the judgment; (5) Once defendant Lindsay, through her insurer, has discharged her obligations under the settlement, she shall be fully and finally discharged and released from any and all further liability to plaintiff C.W. (or anyone acting on her behalf), arising out of the incident made the basis of this lawsuit, as further set out; The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/15/14. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/15/14. (scn, )
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Settlement Approval of Pro-Ami by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed, Karen Mastin Laneaux, and Christy Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crow, Michael) Modified on 3/27/2014 to add joint filers pursuant to PDF document (scn, ).
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Evidentiary Hearing re Proposed Settlemetn held on 3/7/2014 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Mitchell Reisner.) (Attachments: #1 Witness List) (ag, )
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT, by Karen Mastin Laneaux. (scn, )
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SEALED Guardian Ad Litem's Initial Report re #36 Order. (scn, )
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE by Karen Mastin Laneaux Appointment Acceptance (Laneaux, Karen)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER directing that, based on the representations made on the record on February 27, 2014, it is ORDERED that the motion for appointment of a guardian ad litem (doc. no. #33 ) for the minor C.W. is granted as follows: (1) Karen Laneaux, Esq., 207 Montgomery Street, Bell Building, Suite 1010, Montgomery, Alabama 36109, 334.269.5930, <, is appointed as guardian ad litem to represent the minor C.W.; (2) Defendant Christy Lindsay is to pay the attorney's fees and expenses of the guardian ad litem, as further set out; (3) The clerk of the court is to arrange for the guardian ad litem to receive a copy of the file in this case; (4) A fairness hearing on the proposed settlement is set for March 7, 2014, at 4:00 p.m. at the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, Courtroom 2FMJ, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama 36104, as further set out; (5) On or before 8:00 a.m. on March 6, 2014, the guardian ad litem is to file, under seal, a report as to whether and, if so, why the court should approve the proposed settlement for the minor. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/28/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG/Finance.) (Case file sent via CM/ECF to Attorney Laneaux.)(scn, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER directing as follows: (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment (doc. no. #23 ) is denied as moot; (2) The pretrial and trial are continued generally. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/28/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)(Term'd: Final PTC 03/07/2014 and Jury Trial 04/14/2014)(scn, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ***Attorney Karen Mastin Laneaux for Karen Mastin Laneaux added pursuant to #36 Order. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (scn, )
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Telephone Conference re #33 M/Appoint Guardian ad Litem held on 2/27/2014 (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 2:54 - 3:02.) (ag, ) (Main Document 34 replaced on 3/7/2014) (ag, ).
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Telephone Conference re #33 M/Appoint Guardian ad Litem set for 2/27/2014 02:45 PM by telephone before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. (ag, )
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed. (Crow, Michael)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Settlement, by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed, and Christy Lindsay (Crow, Michael) Modified on 2/25/2014 to add joint filer (scn, ).
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL HEARING on March 7, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers 200FMJ, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U. S. Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; the parties are DIRECTED to prepare JOINTLY a proposed pretrial order in accordance with the attached outline, as further set out; TRIAL TERM COMMENCES April 14, 2014, in Opelika, Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/14/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)(scn, )
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY to #28 Response to Motion re Defendant's #23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Christy Lindsay. (Jackson, Micheal) Modified on 1/14/2014 to correct docket relationships and clean up docket text pursuant to PDF document (qc/scn, ).
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 motion to file under seal. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/7/14. (scn, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 EVIDENTIARY SUBMISSION RE #28 SEALED RESPONSE TO #23 MOTION for Summary Judgement, filed by C.W. and Mary Amanda Weed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(scn, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed. (scn, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed. (Crow, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2014: #1 Response to Motion, #2 Evidentiary Submission, #3 Evidentiary Submission Exhibit 1, #4 Evidentiary Submission Exhibit 2, #5 Evidentiary Submission Exhibit 3, #6 Evidentiary Submission Exhibit 4, #7 Evidentiary Submission Exhibit 5, #8 Evidentiary Submission Exhibit 6) (scn, ).
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed, and Christy Lindsay (Crow, Michael) Modified on 1/2/2014 to add joint filer pursuant to PDF document (scn, ).
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing that the motion for summary judgment (doc. no. #23 ) is set for submission, without oral argument, on January 13, 2014, with any opposition brief and evidentiary materials due by January 3, 2014, and any reply to the opposition due by January 13, 2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/11/13. (scn, )
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christy Lindsay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Depo. of Christy Lindsay, #2 Exhibit Exh. B - Depo. of Ellison Weed, #3 Exhibit Exh. C - Depo. of Amanda Weed, #4 Exhibit Exh. D - Depo. of Carly Weed)(Jackson, Micheal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2014: #5 REDACTED Motion, #6 REDACTED Exhibit A, #7 REDACTED Exhibit B, #8 REDACTED Exhibit C, #9 REDACTED Exhibit D) (scn, ). Document has been edited to restrict access to personal information pursuant to the E-Government Act on 2/12/2014 (scn, ).
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER setting: Final Pretrial Conference for 03/07/2014; Jury Trial for 04/14/2014; Amended Pleadings due from Plaintiffs by 06/14/2013 and from the Defendant by 07/15/2013; Discovery due by 12/09/2013; Dispositive Motions due by 12/07/2013; Mediation Notice due by 1/2/2014; as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/19/13. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)(scn, )
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crow, Michael)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of #9 Amended Complaint signed by (ILLEGIBLE) for Christy Lindsay served on 4/5/2013, answer due 4/26/2013. (scn, )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Christy Lindsay.(Jackson, Micheal)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christy Lindsey, filed by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed.(Crow, Michael)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for leave to amend complaint, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/5/13. (scn, )
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 26(f) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than April 19, 2013, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/5/13. (scn, )
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Crow, Michael)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christy Lindsey re #13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Jackson, Micheal)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Christy Lindsey. Corporate Disclosures due by 4/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Standing ORDER and sample format)(scn, )
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Christy Lindsey re #11 Answer to Complaint [Notice of Proceeding to Alabama Attorney General] filed by (Jackson, Micheal)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Christy Lindsey.(Jackson, Micheal)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of #4 Summons and #1 Complaint signed by (ILLEGIBLE) for Christy Lindsey served on 3/13/2013, answer due 4/3/2013. (scn, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christy Lindsey, filed by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed.(Crow, Michael)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/19/13. (scn, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Crow, Michael)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that the plaintiffs have until March 27, 2013, to amend the #1 complaint to allege jurisdiction sufficiently; otherwise this lawsuit shall be dismissed without prejudice, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/15/13. (scn, )
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (scn, )
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christy Lindsey; mailed CMRRR with copy of Complaint. (wcl, )
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Crow, Michael)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to C.W. and Mary Amanda Weed; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for C.W., Mary Amanda Weed. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christy Lindsey (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602026211.), filed by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(wcl, )
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C.W., Mary Amanda Weed. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.W. et al v. Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.W.
Represented By: Michael J. Crow
Represented By: John Wesley McCollum, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney Karen Mastin Laneaux
Represented By: Karen Mastin Laneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Amanda Weed
Represented By: Michael J. Crow
Represented By: John Wesley McCollum, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Lindsay
Represented By: Micheal Stewart Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?