Green v. JA Cattle Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bethany Green
Defendant: JA Cattle Company, LLC and Lowe's Home Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00651
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 49 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/5/2015. (dmn, )
July 21, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 45 MOTION for lift of stay is GRANTED; (2) the clerk is to REOPEN this case administratively and place it on the active docket; (3) the 18 uniform scheduling order is amended to reflect that the Pretrial C onference is set for 11/30/2015 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 1/4/2016 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson, with all unexpired deadlines attached to those dates adjusted accordingly. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/21/15. Furnished to calendar group & AG.(djy, )
March 31, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The joint motion to stay (doc. no. 33 ) is granted; (2) All proceedings in this case are stayed until further order of the court; (3) The clerk of the court is to close this case administratively; (4) On or before th e first Monday of each July to follow and the first Monday of each January to follow, the parties are to file a joint report as to the status of the criminal proceeding and as to whether the stay of this case should be continued. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on March 31, 2015. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. JA Cattle Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Green
Represented By: William David Bence
Represented By: Michael Wilson Slocumb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JA Cattle Company, LLC
Represented By: Jess Street Boone
Represented By: Jeffrey Edwin Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Center, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Elliott Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?