Mann v. Towne et al

Plaintiff: Randall E. Mann
Defendant: City of Dadeville, Alabama, Chris McCrane and Jason C. Towne
Case Number: 3:2013cv00668
Filed: September 18, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Tallapoosa
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove this case from the September 29, 2014 Opelika trial docket; (2) The parties are given 21 days to file a stipulation for dismissal of this case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/26/14. (Furnished to Calendar/EB) (scn, )
September 17, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, for the reasons discussed, the Plaintiff's objections to the deposition designations by the Defendants are OVERRULED, to the extent that the designations must be offered within the requirements of Rule 32 at trial; the Defe ndants' objections are SUSTAINED only as to the designation of Towne's Deposition p. 15: 11-16; the objections are OVERRULED in all other respects, with the understanding that relevance of City of Dadeville policies must be established before that deposition testimony is relevant, and that Rule 403 balancing as to the evidence regarding the traffic stop will be conducted at trial. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/17/14. (scn, )
June 23, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1) The 22 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Outside Deadlines to Amend Pleadings is GRANTED and the Plf may file the Amended Complaint attached to the Motion; 2) The court will construe the Dfts' 24 Respons e as a supplement to its 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; 3) In his response to the originally-filed Motion for Summary Judgment, due 7/1/2014, the Plf also must respond to the arguments and evidence included in the 24 supplement; 4) The Dfts' reply deadline in support of summary judgment, as set by the court (Doc. # 14 ), remains 7/14/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/23/2014. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Towne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dadeville, Alabama
Represented By: Randall C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris McCrane
Represented By: Randall C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason C. Towne
Represented By: Randall C. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall E. Mann
Represented By: Anthony B. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?