Cook v. The Hughston Clinic, P.C. et al

Plaintiff: Lorraine Cook
Defendant: The Hughston Clinic, P.C. and Fred C. Flandry
Case Number: 3:2014cv00296
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Russell
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff's Pro Se Objection to the Settlement (Doc. # 79 ), Plaintiffs Objection to the Recommendation (Doc. # 95 ), and Defendants' Objection to the Recommendation (Doc. # 96 ) are SUSTAINED to the extent that th e settlement agreement, assuming that it was valid and enforceable when signed, will not be enforced because it was rescinded. 2. The Recommendation (Doc. # 91 ) is REJECTED as moot. 3. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. # 78 ) is DENIED. 4. Plaintiff's counsels motion to withdraw (Doc. # 81 ) is GRANTED. 5. Plaintiff has until November 16, 2015, to find new counsel and to have said counsel make an appearance in this matter, or to state in writing to this court her intention to rep resent herself as a pro se plaintiff. Failure of Plaintiff to comply with this directive may result in the dismissal of her case. 6. This action is STAYED until further order of the court with the exception that Defendants' oral motion for sanct ions is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge Moorer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636.7. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to furnish this Order to Plaintiff at the address on file with the court. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/15/2015. (kh, )
February 9, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the defendants' 49 Motion to Strike be and is hereby DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/9/2015. (dmn, )
January 28, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Defendants' 49 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Supplemental Expert Report. It is ORDERED that on or before 2/8/2015, the plaintiff shall file a response which informs the court whether the CAT scans identified in Dr. Tonk s' amended supplemental report are the same images referred to as "a few of the radiological images" in his supplemental expert report. The court reserves ruling on the defendants' 49 Motion to Strike until the plaintiff's response is received. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/28/2015. (dmn, )
January 8, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing the defendants' notice of conflict as a motion to reschedule and motion to stay application of deposition deadline; GRANTING 46 MOTION Reschedule ; Oral Argument presently set for 1/27/2015 is reset for 1/22/2015 @ 0 2:00 PMbefore Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody, in Courtroom 4B, FMJ Fed Bldg & US Courthouse Complex, Montgomery, AL; further ORDERING that the 46 motion to stay be and is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/8/15. Furnished to calendar group & WS.(djy, )
December 23, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER the defendants' 29 MOTION to Strike be and is hereby GRANTED to the extent that Nurse Hiedel and Dr. Lakatosh are prohibited from testifying as expert witnesses pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. at the trial of this matter . The parties are DIRECTED to fully disclose and discuss with Chief United States District Judge W. Keith Watkins, at the pretrial conference of this case, the evidentiary issues surrounding the testimony of Nurse Hiedel and Dr. Lakatosh at trial. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs counsel, Thomas Edward Dutton, shall pay to the defendant the reasonable costs and expenses, including attorneys fees, related to the 29 motion to strike. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/23/2014. (dmn, )
November 17, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the defendants' motion to strike (doc. # 21 ) be and is hereby DENIED; it is further ORDERED as follows: (1) That, on or before December 15, 2014, the plaintiff shall provide supplemental expert witne ss reports that fully comply with FED.R.CIV.P. 26(a)(2)(B), as further set out; (2) That the defendants shall have until January 31, 2015 to take the depositions of the plaintiff's expert witnesses; (3) That the FED.R.CIV.P. 26(a)(2)(B) reports of any experts retained by the defendants shall be provided to the plaintiff on or before March 1, 2015; (4) That the plaintiff shall have until March 31, 2015 to take the depositions of the defendants' expert witnesses; (5) The dispositive moti on deadline be and is hereby EXTENDED from March 6, 2015 to April 6, 2015; (6) That plaintiff's counsel, Thomas Edward Dutton, shall pay all of defense counsel's reasonable costs and expenses, including attorney's fees, related to the motion to strike, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/17/14. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. The Hughston Clinic, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Cook
Represented By: Michael Cory Bradley
Represented By: Thomas Edward Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hughston Clinic, P.C.
Represented By: Jack Buster Hinton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred C. Flandry
Represented By: Jack Buster Hinton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?