Garza v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Ray Abraham Garza
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv00175
Filed: March 19, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the 42 USC 406(b), the 20 and 24 petitions for Attorney's Fees be and are hereby GRANTED, to the extent that the Commissioner shall pay to the plf's attor ney $13,987.31 of the amount previously withheld from the plf's past due benefits; further ORDERING that plfs counsel shall pay to the plf $4,431.23 which represents previously awarded fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act; in all other respects, the motions for attorney's fees be and are hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/1/17. (djy, )
December 14, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. That the 16 Motion for Attorney's Fees be and is hereby GRANTED and the plaintiff be and is hereby AWARDED fees in the amount of $4,431.23. 2. To the extent that plaintiff's counsel requests that fees should be awarded directly to counsel, 28 U.S.C. 2412(d)(1)(A) authorizes the court to award fees to the prevailing party. See 28 U.S.C. (d)(2)(B). See also Reeves, supra. The motion that fees be paid directly to counsel be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/14/2016. (dmn, )
September 13, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, in accordance with the 14 memorandum opinion entered herewith, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner be and is hereby REVERSED and this case be and hereby is REMANDED to the Commissioner for an award of benefits. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/13/16. Certified copy of Memorandum Opinion and Order and this Judgment also mailed to Office of Hearings and Appeals and Chief Judge SSA.(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Abraham Garza
Represented By: Darryl Wayne Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?