Martinez Gonzalez v. Preston

Plaintiff: Maria Magdalena Martinez Gonzalez
Defendant: Thomas David Preston
Case Number: 3:2015cv00282
Filed: April 28, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing respondent Thomas David Preston deliver physical custody of the children to a designated official of the Consulate General of Mexico at the Atlanta International Airport for travel to Mexico three hours before the scheduled departu re of their flight, as further set out in order; the designated official of the Consulate General of Mexico will have physical custody of the children solely for the purpose of their return flight and shall transfer physical custody of the children to petitioner Martinez once the children arrive at the pre-determined meeting place in Mexico. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/27/15. (djy, )
May 12, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The court's 6 temporary restraining order is turned into a preliminary injunction and extended to last until the termination of this case; (2) Dft Thomas David Preston is prohibited f rom removing the children, O.M.P.M. and T.D.P.M., from the area known as the "Valley," including Lanett, Alabama and surrounding towns, until the termination of this case. Likewise, no person acting in concert or participating with dft Pres ton (including but not limited to his mother, Lurlie Cole Jennings) shall take any action to remove the children from the "Valley." This order binds dft Thomas David Preston, Lurlie Cole Jennings, the parties' officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys; and all other persons who are in active concert or participation with the parties or their officers, agents, servants, employees, or attorneys. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/12/2015. (wcl, )
April 29, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Plf Mara Magdalena Martinez Gonzlez's 3 motion for a temporary restraining order and to schedule expedited hearing is granted; (2) Dft Thomas David Preston is prohibited from removing the children, O.M.P.M. and T.D.P.M., from Lanett, Alabama pending a hearing on the merits of the verified complaint. Likewise, no person acting in concert or participating with dft Preston (including but not limited to his mother, Lurlie Cole Jenning s) shall take any action to remove the children from the city of Lanett; (3) A hearing on the merits of the verified complaint is scheduled to be held on 5/12/2015, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 2FMJ of the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; (4) Dft Preston is hereby directed to show cause at the hearing scheduled in paragraph (3) above why the children should not be returned forthwith to Mexico and why other relief requested in the verifi ed complaint should not be granted; further ORDERED that the US Marshal Service is forthwith to serve personally a copy of this order, along with the summons and copies of the complaint and the attachments and accompanying motions, on dft Thomas Davi d Preston and on Ms. Lurlie Cole Jennings; This order binds dft Thomas David Preston, Lurlie Cole Jennings, the parties' officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys; and all other persons who are in active concert or participation with the parties or their officers, agents, servants, employees, or attorneys. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/29/2015. (furn: calendar, ag, USMS)(wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Gonzalez v. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Magdalena Martinez Gonzalez
Represented By: Catherine Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas David Preston
Represented By: Thomas Martele Goggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?