City of Phenix City, Alabama, Phenix City Red Light Safety Program v. Carroll (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)
Plaintiff: |
City of Phenix City, Alabama, Phenix City Red Light Safety Program |
Defendant: |
Jerry Paul Carroll |
Counter_claimant: |
Jerry Paul Carroll |
Counter_defendant: |
City of Phenix City, Alabama, Phenix City Red Light Safety Program |
Movant: |
Redflex Traffic Systems Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00748 |
Filed: |
October 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Opelika Office |
County: |
Russell |
Presiding Judge: |
Gray Michael Borden |
Presiding Judge: |
William Keith Watkins |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 12, 2016 |
Filing
39
ORDERED that Defendant Jerry Paul Carroll's 38 motion for a stay of remand is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/12/2016. (kh, )
|
April 5, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDERED as follows: (1) Defendant's 29 objection is OVERRULED; (2) The 28 Recommendation is ADOPTED; (3) Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand (Docs. # 9 , 13 ) are GRANTED for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction; (4) This case is REMANDED to the Municipal Court of Phenix City, Alabama; and (5) All remaining outstanding motions (Docs. # 4 , 11 , 21 , 22 , 23 , 25 ) are DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's 31 Motion for Disqualification and 35 Motion for Summary Judgment are DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to take the steps necessary to effectuate the remand. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/5/2016. (kh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: City of Phenix City, Alabama, Phenix City Red Light Safety Program v. Carroll (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+) |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: City of Phenix City, Alabama, Phenix City Red Light Safety Program |
Represented By: |
Glenn Channing Gamble |
Represented By: |
James P. Graham, Jr. |
Represented By: |
James Robert McKoon, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jerry Paul Carroll |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Jerry Paul Carroll |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: City of Phenix City, Alabama, Phenix City Red Light Safety Program |
Represented By: |
Glenn Channing Gamble |
Represented By: |
James P. Graham, Jr. |
Represented By: |
James Robert McKoon, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Movant: Redflex Traffic Systems Inc. |
Represented By: |
John Thomas Richie |
Represented By: |
Ryan Patrick Robichaux |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?