Danley et al v. Liberty Bank and Trust Company (JOINT ASSIGN)

Appellant: Stacy L. Danley, II and Stephanie L. Danley
Appellee: Liberty Bank and Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv00821
Filed: November 3, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Opelika Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Danleys' Application for Rehearing, ECF No. 36 , is DENIED as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Jane A. Restani on 8/22/2016. (kh, )
July 29, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Danleys' 24 and 26 motions to amend the notice of appeal and supplement the record are DENIED and Liberty's 14 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Jane A. Restani on 7/29/2016. (kh, )
November 4, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the 2 Emergency Motion to Stay Foreclosure Pending Appeal is DENIED as further set out in the order. It is further ORDERED that the 3 Motion for Expedited Hearing on Emergency Motion to Stay Foreclosure is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/4/2015. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danley et al v. Liberty Bank and Trust Company (JOINT ASSIGN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stacy L. Danley, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephanie L. Danley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Liberty Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Leonard Norman Math(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?