Edwards v. Cofield et al

Plaintiff: Kandace Kay Edwards
Defendant: David Cofield, Christopher May, Jill Puckett and Clay Tinney
Case Number: 3:2017cv00321
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Opelika Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Doc. # 5 ) is GRANTED; 2. The following class is CERTIFIED pursuant to Rule 23(a) and (b)(2): all state-court arrestees who are or who will be jailed in Randolph County who are unable to pay the secured money bail amount required for their release; 3. Attorneys Alex Karakatsanis, Esq., Samuel Brooke, Esp., Randall C. Marshall, Esq., and Brandon Buskey, Esq., are DESIGNATED as class counsel; and 4. Plaintiff Kandace Kay Edwards is DESIGNATED as the representative of the class. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/10/2018. (kh, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. # 99 ) is DENIED. On another note, it is further ORDERED that the motion to substitute party (Doc. # 109 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to substitute Amy Newsome for Clay Tinney as Defendant pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/28/2018. (kh, )
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction (Doc. # 67 ) is DENIED; and 2. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. # 3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/21/2018. (kh, )
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant Cofield's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 30 ) is DENIED, and that Defendant Cofield shall file an answer to the complaint on or before July 28, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the other Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 46 ) is also DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/14/2017. (kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Cofield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandace Kay Edwards
Represented By: Samuel Jacob Brooke
Represented By: Brandon Buskey
Represented By: Katherine Hubbard
Represented By: Alec Karakatsanis
Represented By: Randall C Marshall
Represented By: Micah West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cofield
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher May
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Puckett
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Tinney
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?