Jin v. Kmin USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heejoo Jin
Defendant: Kmin USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00693
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Opelika Office
County: Chambers
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Kmin USA, Inc., Heejoo Jin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Willis, Kathryn) Modified on 9/17/2018 to include additional filer. (dmn, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Willis, Kathryn)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Heejoo Jin. (Kim, Brian)
August 20, 2018 ***Attorney Ingu Hwang added for Kmin USA, Inc. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #9 for pdf.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kmin USA, Inc.. (Willis, Kathryn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kmin USA, Inc..(Willis, Kathryn)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge. Chief Judge William Keith Watkins, Honorable Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. (dmn, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER vacating #6 Order Reassigning and Referring Case to Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/8/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [VACATED PURSUANT TO 7 TEXT ORDER.] ORDER REASSIGNING AND REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable David A. Baker for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/3/2018. (alm, ) Modified on 8/8/2018 (dmn, ).
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins as Presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (alm, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Kim Jusan for Kmin USA, Inc. served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (alm, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Heejoo Jin. (dmn, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Kmin USA, Inc. (dmn, )
July 27, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Heejoo Jin. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc. #1 for pdf.)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kmin USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050129.), filed by Heejoo Jin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jin v. Kmin USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heejoo Jin
Represented By: Brian Gene Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kmin USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Morris Willis
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?