Lake Martin Realty, Inc. et al v. The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Lake Martin Realty, LLC and Lake Martin Realty, Inc.
Defendant: The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00798
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Hearing on #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief: Motion Hearing SET for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in CR 2A in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks. It is further ORDERED that counsel shall file briefs in support of or in opposition to the motion on or before noon on 12/14/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 11/9/2018. Copies furnished to calendar group, WS. (dmn, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/29/2018. (dmn, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC.(Segrest, John)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/12/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC. (Segrest, John)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC. (Segrest, John)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #2 Motion, and #3 & #4 Corporate Disclosure Statements signed by Dusty D. Bowles for The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (wcl, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued; summons, #1 complaint, #2 motion, corporate/conflict disclosure statements (docs. #3 , #4 ) mailed CMRRR to The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC. (dmn, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lake Martin Realty, Inc. (dmn, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lake Martin Realty, LLC. (dmn, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lake Martin Realty, Inc., Lake Martin Realty, LLC. (dmn, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050692.), filed by Lake Martin Realty, Inc., Lake Martin Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Martin Realty, Inc. et al v. The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lake Martin Real Estate Company, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Martin Realty, LLC
Represented By: William Claude McGowin
Represented By: Jonathan Corley Hill
Represented By: Michael Sandlin Denniston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Martin Realty, Inc.
Represented By: William Claude McGowin
Represented By: Jonathan Corley Hill
Represented By: Michael Sandlin Denniston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?