JP Morgan Chase Bank v. Gibbs et al
Plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Defendant: Tawana Gibbs and United States Department of Agriculture Rural Housing Service
Case Number: 3:2018cv00953
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Monaghan, Barney)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to JP Morgan Chase Bank; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) JP Morgan Chase Bank, and (defendant) United States Department of Agriculture Rural Housing Service. (djy, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Agriculture Rural Housing Service.(djy, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States Department of Agriculture Rural Housing Service. (djy, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to state court by United States Department of Agriculture Rural Housing Service re filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (djy, )
November 8, 2018 COMPLAINT against Tawana Gibbs, United States Department of Agriculture Rural Housing Service, filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).(djy, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Agriculture Rural Housing Service from Circuit Court of Russell County, Alabama, case number 57-CV-2018-900290.00. (Attachments: #1 state court complaint for interpleader, #2 Exhibit A-state court record, #3 civil cover sheet)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JP Morgan Chase Bank v. Gibbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tawana Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Rural Housing Service
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Andy Saag
Represented By: Barney Andrew Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?