Patrick v. City of Tuskegee, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Lester Patrick
Defendant: City of Tuskegee, Alabama and Bernard Houston
Case Number: 3:2018cv01058
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mills, Wallace)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by City of Tuskegee, Alabama, Bernard Houston.(Carter, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/12/2019. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 2/12/2019 as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/24/2019. (dmn, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Tuskegee, Alabama, Bernard Houston.(Carter, Elizabeth)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lester Patrick. (Mills, Wallace)
January 7, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #4 CONFLICT STATEMENT - Attorney Reed Morgan Coleman for City of Tuskegee, Alabama and Bernard Houston added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Tuskegee, Alabama, Bernard Houston re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Carter, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to City of Tuskegee, Alabama, Bernard Houston; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for City of Tuskegee, Alabama, Bernard Houston, Lester Patrick - ALL PARTIES. (wcl, )
December 20, 2018 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by City of Tuskegee, Alabama, Bernard Houston re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
December 20, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lester Patrick. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
December 20, 2018 COMPLAINT against City of Tuskegee, Alabama, Bernard Houston, filed by Lester Patrick. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf)(wcl, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Tuskegee, Alabama, Bernard Houston from Circuit Court of Macon County, Alabama, case number 46-cv-18-900168.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051807) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing, #4 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. City of Tuskegee, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Patrick
Represented By: Wallace Damon Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tuskegee, Alabama
Represented By: Elizabeth Brannen Carter
Represented By: Reed Morgan Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Houston
Represented By: Elizabeth Brannen Carter
Represented By: Reed Morgan Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?