Jackson v. East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: James Jackson
Defendant: East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00042
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trueblood, Temple)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/8/2019. (alm, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc..(Oliver, Blake)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Oliver, Blake)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Lee Oliver on behalf of East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc. (Oliver, Blake)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. (Trueblood, Temple)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER striking the #6 Rule 26(f) Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 1/22/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S TEXT ORDER [DOC 7]) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks on 1/22/2019. (alm, ) Modified on 1/22/2019 (alm, ).
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Rachel Holder for East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (alm, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Jackson re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Trueblood, Temple) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/15/2019 to attach a corrected pdf to include the date, which was previously omitted in error) (alm, ) Modified on 1/15/2019 to add the link to the #2 Notice (alm, ).
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to James Jackson; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
January 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James Jackson. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00; receipt number 4602052052), filed by James Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jackson
Represented By: Temple DeAnna Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Alabama Lumber Co., Inc.
Represented By: Blake Lee Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?