Thomas v. Seohan Auto Corporation (CONSENT)

Plaintiff: Rodney Thomas
Defendant: Seohan Auto Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00054
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5A, before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel Jr.; Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020, in Opelika, Alabama, before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel Jr.; Dispositive Motions due by 11/19/2019; Mediation Notice due by 11/16/2019; Amended Pleadings by Plf due by 3/29/2019, and by Dft due by 4/30/2019; Discovery due by 11/5/2019, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/12/2019. (furn: Calendar, KF) (wcl, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge E-signed by Counsel for Rodney Thomas. (wcl, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge E-signed by Counsel for Seohan Auto Corporation. (wcl, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hwang, Ingu)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Correction re #6 Answer to Complaint and #7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach the corrected PDF documents to correct the division in the court heading. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry #6 , #2 Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry #7 )(kr, )
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/7/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 3/7/2019, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/15/2019. (kr, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Seohan Auto Corporation. (kr, )
February 14, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 ANSWER - Attorney Michael Lee Lucas for Seohan Auto Corporation added. (No pdf attached) (kr, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Seohan Auto Corporation. (Hwang, Ingu) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/15/2019) (kr, ).
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Seohan Auto Corporation.(Hwang, Ingu) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/15/2019) (kr, ).
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by Alex A. for Seohan Auto Corporation served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (kr, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Rodney Thomas. (wcl, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Seohan Auto Corporation; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (wcl, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rodney Thomas. (wcl, )
January 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rodney Thomas. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seohan Auto Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052104.), filed by Rodney Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Request for Service by CMRRR, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Seohan Auto Corporation (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Thomas
Represented By: Patricia Anne Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seohan Auto Corporation
Represented By: Michael Lee Lucas
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?