Norton et al v. Mahek LLC
Plaintiff: Cheryl D. Jones, Renauldo Jackson and Jennifer Norton
Defendant: Mahek LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Norton. (Epperson, Robert) Modified on 3/14/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Renauldo Jackson & Cheryl Jones and as satisfying #13 notice of deficiency (qc/djy, ).
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mahek LLC re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Frederick, Brandi)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jennifer Norton, Cheryl D. Jones, and Renauldo Jackson; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mahek LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Frederick, Brandi)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/13/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 3/13/2019, as further se tout in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/21/19. (djy, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Mahek LLC. (djy, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mahek LLC.(Frederick, Brandi)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandi Branton Frederick on behalf of Mahek LLC (Frederick, Brandi)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by (illegible) on (no date given) for MAHEK, LLC. (djy, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of alias summons and complaint signed by (no signature) for Mahek LLC served on (no date given). answer due 2/20/2019. (djy, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Alias Summons issued as to Mahek LLC and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint. (djy, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiffs) Renauldo Jackson, Cheryl D. Jones, Jennifer Norton (djy, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mahek LLC and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
January 18, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Renauldo Jackson, Cheryl D. Jones, Jennifer Norton. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-see Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mahek LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052113.), filed by Jennifer Norton, Cheryl D. Jones, Renauldo Jackson. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton et al v. Mahek LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahek LLC
Represented By: Brandi Branton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl D. Jones
Represented By: Robert C. Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renauldo Jackson
Represented By: Robert C. Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Norton
Represented By: Robert C. Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?