Farmers Insurance Exchange et al v. Gordon et al

Plaintiff: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange and Mid-Century Insurance Company
Defendant: David Scott Gordon and Cornerstone Insurance & Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00163
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why #4 MOTION to deposit money into the court should not be granted, as further set out in order; Show Cause Response due by 4/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/25/19. (djy, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange. (Harold, Edward) Modified on 3/14/2019 to clarify text to reflect as satisfying #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , & #9 (qc/djy, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mid-Century Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Truck Insurance Exchange; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Fire Insurance Exchange; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Farmers New World Life Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Farmers Insurance Exchange; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
March 8, 2019 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for interpleader deposit (28 USC Section 1335) filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #4 ). (djy, ) .
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for interpleader deposit (28 USC Section 1335) by Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Gordon's 2017 AAA, #2 Exhibit 2 Gordon's CV Approval Form)(Harold, Edward) Modified on 3/25/2019 to correct event code to interpleader deposit (qc/djy, ).
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cornerstone Insurance & Financial Group, Inc., David Scott Gordon and mailed with stamped copy of complaint to counsel for personal service on defendants via process server. (djy, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 Received Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602052611 (djy, )
March 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry #1 ). (djy, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for injunctive relief and monetary damages against Cornerstone Insurance & Financial Group, Inc., David Scott Gordon, filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Farmers New World Life Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 civil cover sheet)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Insurance Exchange et al v. Gordon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Scott Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Insurance & Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward F. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?