United States of America v. $96,318.00 In United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $96,318.00 In United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00202
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINAL JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the Court that judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Plf, the United States of America, and against the Dft, $96,318.00, with costs taxed as paid; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(alm, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECREE OF FORFEITURE: it is ORDERED as follows: The #11 motion for decree of forfeiture GRANTED; The Dft $96,318.00 in United States currency is hereby forfeited to the United States, to be disposed of according to law, and no right, title or interest in the Dft shall exist in any other party. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/25/2019. (Attachment(s): #1 Civil Appeals Checklist (alm, ) Modified on 6/26/2019 to attach the civil appeals checklist (alm, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (alm, )
June 24, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Wallace Capel Jr: #11 MOTION for Decree of Forfeiture. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Decree of Forfeiture by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neeley, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Brandon Clark and all other persons and entities having an interest in the Defendant property who have failed to timely defend as required by law. (alm, )
June 12, 2019 Copy of #9 Application and case filed delivered to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by United States of America against Brandon Clark and all other persons and entities having an interest in the Defendant property who have failed to timely defend as required by law. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Application and Request to Enter Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Neeley, Robert)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Publication by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Notice of Forfeiture Action and Advertisement Certification Report) (Neeley, Robert)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #4 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Attorney William C. White, II (c/o Clayton Tartt) on 4/4/2019.(alm, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #4 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Brandon Clark, c/o U.S. Marshals Service, on 4/1/2019. (alm, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #4 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on $96,318.00 in United States Currency, c/o U.S. Marshals Service, on 3/28/2019. (alm, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM issued & furnished to USMS for service. (alm, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for United States of America. (alm, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (alm, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $96,318.00 In United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Personal Property, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $96,318.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $96,318.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?