Christman v. Specialized Loan Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie A. Christman
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon and Specialized Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00214
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER GRANTING the #19 MOTION for Extension. (NO PDF attached to this entry). Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 7/8/2019. (am, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Order to Show Cause, by Specialized Loan Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Reeves, Timothy)
June 26, 2019 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing that on or before 7/9/2019, the Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE why the motion should not be granted; It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff may file a reply to the Defendants' response on or before 7/16/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/25/2019. (am, )
May 3, 2019 BRIEF in Support of #17 MOTION to Remand filed by Stephanie A. Christman. (NO PDF attached to this entry - see doc #17 .) (am, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand by Stephanie A. Christman. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Russell, Valerie)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 First ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, Counterclaim by Stephanie A. Christman.(Russell, Valerie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks: TelephoneStatus Conference held on 5/2/2019 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Patricia Starkie.) (ws, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: setting on-the-record Pretrial Conference for 7/1/2020 @ 10:30 AM before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks, in CR 2A, FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; DIRECTING parties to jointly prepare a proposed Pretrial Order on or before 6/24/2020; Trial set for 8/10/2020 before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks, in Opelika, AL; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 1/3/2020; Mediation Notice due not more than 5 days after the Settlement Conference; Amendments Pleadings due by 6/14/2019; Discovery completed on or before 12/4/2019 as further set out in Order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/2/2019. Furnished to Calendar Group & WS(am, ) Modified on 6/5/2019 to include Uniform language (am, ).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: In light of the parties' filing of the Rule 26 planning report, the status and scheduling conference presently set in Courtroom 2A on May 2, 2019 be and is hereby RESET to a telephone conference call at 11:00 a.m.; The parties are DIRECTED to contact Courtroom Deputy Wanda Stinson for the call in number and access code. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/1/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Furn: Calendar, WS)(kr, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reeves, Timothy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Stephanie A. Christman by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Note, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Modification, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 Assignment, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Notice of Default, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 Notice of Foreclosure Sale, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 Affidavit of Publication, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 Foreclosure Deed, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Notice to Vacate)(Reeves, Timothy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Services, LLC.(Reeves, Timothy)
April 15, 2019 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephanie A. Christman re #7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (NO PDF attached - See doc #9 , which was incorrectly entered on the docket as a Notice.) (am, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Stephanie A. Christman Conflict Disclosure Statement (Russell, Valerie)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: GRANTING #6 MOTION to Continue; the status and scheduling conference presently set for 4/9/2019 be and is hereby CONTINUED to 5/2/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks, in Courtroom 2A, US Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; directing that the Clerk shall provide a court reporter for this proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/3/2019. (Furnished to Calendar Group and WS; Terminated Status & Schedule Conference 4/9/2019).(am, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Stephanie A. Christman; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Preliminary MOTION to Continue Status and Scheduling Conference by Stephanie A. Christman. (Russell, Valerie)
April 1, 2019 Correct Hearings for Calendar Purposes - Status and Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks, in CR 2A, United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. (NO PDF attached to this notice. See docket entry #5 )(am, ).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing that this matter be and is hereby SET for a status and scheduling hearing on April 9, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Chief US District Judge Emily C Marks, in Courtroom 2A, United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama and directing that the Clerk shall provide a court reporter for this proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/1/2019. (Furnished to: Calendar group and WS).(am, )
March 28, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Specialized Loan Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon re: Filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #4 for pdf) (wcl, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Evidentiary Submission (Exhibit 4) to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Specialized Loan Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(wcl, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Bank of New York Mellon. (wcl, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Services, LLC. (wcl, )
March 26, 2019 COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon filed by Stephanie A. Christman. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(wcl, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialized Loan Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon from Circuit Court of Lee County, case number 43-CV-2019-900145. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052965) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 - State Court Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Receipt)(wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christman v. Specialized Loan Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Christopher Allen Bottcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Christopher Allen Bottcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie A. Christman
Represented By: Valerie Rucker Russell
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Represented By: Tom Anthony Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?