United States of America v. $13,555.00 In United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $5,000.00 In United States Currency, $13,555.00 In United States Currency and $1,934.00 In United States Currency
Claimant: Tyravious Tyrail Smith and Renaldo Darnez Moore
Case Number: 3:2019cv00312
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM filed by Tyravious Tyrail Smith.(alm, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM filed by Renaldo Darnez Moore.(alm, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 VERIFIED CLAIM filed by Tyravious Tyrail Smith. (alm, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 VERIFIED CLAIM filed by Renaldo Darnez Moore. (alm, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Lewis Wilson on behalf of Tyravious Tyrail Smith. (alm, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Lewis Wilson on behalf of Renaldo Darnez Moore. (alm, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Quentin Eugene Turner, c/o USMS, on 5/2/2019.(alm, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 (ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Quentin Eugene Turner, (c/o C. Turner via FedEx), on 6/14/2019) NOTICE by United States of America (Neeley, Robert) Modified on 6/24/2019 to clarify the docket text to reflect this entry as an acknowledgement of service executed (alm, ).
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Tyravius Tyrail Smith, c/o Attorney Carter Weeks, on 5/7/2019. (alm, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Renaldo Darnez Moore, c/o Attorney Carter Weeks, on 5/7/2019.(alm, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Attorney Clinton Wilson, c/o Attorney Carter Weeks, on 5/7/2019.(alm, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Publication by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Notice of Forfeiture and Advertisement Details Report)(Neeley, Robert) Modified on 6/4/2019 to clarify the docket text (alm, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher as Presiding Judge; Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case. (alm, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Defendant $1,934.00 in United States Currency, c/o US Marshal Service, on 5/3/2019.(alm, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Defendant $5,000.00 in United States Currency, c/o US Marshal Service, on 5/3/2019.(alm, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem & #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem served on Defendant $13,555.00 in United States Currency, c/o US Marshal Service, on 5/3/2019.(alm, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM issued & furnished to USMS for service. (alm, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (alm, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $1,934.00 In United States Currency, $13,555.00 In United States Currency, $5,000.00 In United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Personal Property, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $13,555.00 In United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,000.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,555.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,934.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tyravious Tyrail Smith
Represented By: Clinton Lewis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Renaldo Darnez Moore
Represented By: Clinton Lewis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?