Childress v. Borbet Alabama, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Childress
Defendant: Borbet Alabama, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00415
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: setting Pretrial Conference for 9/17/2020 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks, in Courtroom 2A, FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 @ 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks, in Opelika, Alabama ; directing the parties to jointly prepare the proposed pretrial order not fewer than 7 days prior to the pretrial conference; Amended Pleadings due by 10/24/2019; Discovery completed by 2/19/2020. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 3/20/2020; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2020. Mediation Notice due by 2/24/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/8/19. Furnished to calendar group & WS.(djy, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stewart, Taffiny)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/2/2019; directing counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 7/26/2019.. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/19/19. (djy, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Borbet Alabama, Inc. (djy, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Borbet Alabama, Inc.. (Stewart, Taffiny)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Borbet Alabama, Inc..(Stewart, Taffiny)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Britton Monroe on behalf of Borbet Alabama, Inc. (Monroe, Elliot)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Taffiny Smith Stewart on behalf of Borbet Alabama, Inc. (Stewart, Taffiny)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Borbet Alabama, Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (djy, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Childress. (Wilkinson, Cynthia)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Christopher Childress; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Christopher Childress. (djy, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Borbet Alabama, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
June 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christopher Childress.(NO PDF document attached to this notice-see docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Borbet Alabama, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053916.), filed by Christopher Childress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 request for service by certified mail, #4 civil cover sheet, #5 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childress v. Borbet Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Childress
Represented By: Cynthia Forman Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borbet Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Taffiny Smith Stewart
Represented By: Elliot Britton Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?