Security Pest Control, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Security Pest Control, Inc.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv00541
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association should not be granted. Plf should reply on or before Oct. 18, 2019. Defendant may reply no later than November 1, 2019. Additionally, Defs original Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #6 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/27/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Answer to Counts II and III to First Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(James, Forrest)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (James, Forrest)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Security Pest Control, Inc.. (McDonald, Yawanna)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Security Pest Control, Inc.. (kh, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (kh, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Brock Coulter on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Coulter, Benjamin)
September 13, 2019 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed by Security Pest Control, Inc. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #10 , incorrectly entered on the docket as and Amendment).(djy, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed by Security Pest Control, Inc..(McDonald, Yawanna)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Lee Hayslip on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Hayslip, Victor)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that on or before September 18, 2019, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, why the #6 Motion should not be granted. Defendant may reply on or before October 2, 2019. Additionally, the parties were previously notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and their right to request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. As indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties must confirm their decision to consent to the Magistrate Judge in writing. Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judges jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before September 18, 2019. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/28/2019. (kh, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (James, Forrest)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (James, Forrest)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (kh, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and mailed CMRRR with copy #1 complaint. (kh, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Security Pest Control, Inc.. (McDonald, Yawanna)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Security Pest Control, Inc. (kh, )
July 30, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Security Pest Control, Inc.. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, National Association ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054377.), filed by Security Pest Control, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security Pest Control, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Victor Lee Hayslip
Represented By: Forrest Hood James, IV
Represented By: Benjamin Brock Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Pest Control, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Campbell
Represented By: Yawanna N. McDonald
Represented By: Erin Gail Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?