Starling v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Starling
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00555
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint and Order signed by (no signature) on 8/19/2019 for Andrew Saul. (djy, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint and Order signed by Emily Sase on 8/14/2019 for Attorney General of the United States. (djy, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, Complaint and Order signed by Niachos Wright on 8/8/19 for SSA Office of Regional Counsel Region IV. (djy, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint and #3 order. (djy, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plaintiff to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; defendant's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing. Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/6/19. (djy, ) (djy, ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kimberly D. Starling. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(es, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Kimberly D. Starling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(es, ) Modified on 8/6/2019 to clarify text to reflect as filed against Andrew Saul (qc/djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starling v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Starling
Represented By: Brian Roy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?