Baker et al v. Rabren General Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Baker Construction Services, LLC and Charles Baker
Defendant: Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn and Rabren General Contractors, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00572
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 Objection to re #13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support,,,,,, Objection and Motion to Strike filed by Charles Baker, Baker Construction Services, LLC. (Harben, Christian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 Evidentiary Submission re #18 Response to Motion, filed by Charles Baker, Baker Construction Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 14 - part 1, #15 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 14 - part 2, #16 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit 16)(Harben, Christian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Baker, Baker Construction Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Charles Baker, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Martin Cockson)(Harben, Christian)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for John D. Hafemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/3/2019. (amf, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for John D. Hafemann to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 75.00, receipt number 4602055105) by Charles Baker, Baker Construction Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(amf, )
September 30, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #16 MOTION - Attorney John D. Hafemann for Charles Baker & for Baker Construction Services, LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr as referral judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, )
September 25, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Wallace Capel, Jr.: #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Plfs as to why the #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2019; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/7/2019; DO NOT FILE THE FORM ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/23/2019. (wcl, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bruce Ward, #2 Exhibit A, Ex. 1 - 2019.10.07 B.Ward cover letter to ECJ re New Auburn High School Subcontract, #3 Exhibit A, Ex. 2 - 2015.11.24 Email B.Ward to C.Baker enc Subcontract - ECJ, #4 Exhibit A, Ex. 3 - 2015.12.14 Email B.Ward to C.Baker Re Auburn High School, #5 Exhibit A, Ex. 4 - 2015.12.30 Email C.Baker to B.Ward scanning cost breakdown, #6 Exhibit A, Ex. 5 - Baker Construction Services, LLC's Certificate of Liability Insurance, #7 Exhibit A, Ex. 6 - Emails Re Baker's use of Contract Documents, #8 Exhibit A, Ex. 7 - Change Orders 1-4 from Rabren General Contractors to Baker Construction Services, #9 Exhibit A, Ex. 8 - Baker Construction Certified Pay Applications 21 - 24 to Rabren General Contractors, #10 Exhibit A, Ex. 9 - 2016.07.14 Email Baker Construction to C.Logan Re AP Job Payments - 5285321, #11 Exhibit A, Ex. 10 - 2016.07.28 Email Baker Contruction to Rabren GC Re Auburn High School Payment, #12 Exhibit A, Ex. 11 - 2017.04.20 Hartford 2017.04.20 Response and Michel 2017.04.07 Letter, #13 Exhibit A, Ex. 12 - 2018.04.05 A.Michel Letter to T.Umbach enc Baker Constructions' Draft Complaint, #14 Exhibit A, Ex. 13 - 2015.10.05 Rabren General Contractor Subcontract Agreement with Baker Construction Services -5285360)(Oliver, Thomas) Modified on 9/23/2019 to add the link to the #12 Motion (amf, ). Modified on 9/23/2019 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss by Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn. (Oliver, Thomas) Modified on 9/23/2019 to clarify the docket text (qc/wcl, ).
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Oliver, Thomas)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #7 ), it is ORDERED that the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendants' responsive pleadings shall be due on or before September 20, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/5/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., and Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn. (wcl, )
September 4, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 MOTION - Attorney John David Pugh and John Christopher Selman for Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., and Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension to Respond as to #1 Complaint, by Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn. (Oliver, Thomas) Modified on 9/4/2019 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by CT Corporation for: Rabren General Contractors, L.P. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (wcl, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Statement signed by J.R. Allen for Rabren General Contractors, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (wcl, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (wcl, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Charles Baker, Baker Construction Services, LLC. (wcl, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charles Baker, Baker Construction Services, LLC. (wcl, )
August 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charles Baker, Baker Construction Services, LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rabren General Contractors, Inc., Rabren General Contractors, L.P., Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054518.), filed by Baker Construction Services, LLC, Charles Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Rabren General Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabren General Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: John Christopher Selman
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: John David Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabren General Contractors, L.P. of Auburn
Represented By: John Christopher Selman
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: John David Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabren General Contractors, L.P.
Represented By: John Christopher Selman
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: John David Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker Construction Services, LLC
Represented By: Christian William Harben
Represented By: Sidney Warren Jackson, III
Represented By: John D. Hafemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Baker
Represented By: Christian William Harben
Represented By: Sidney Warren Jackson, III
Represented By: John D. Hafemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?