McCormick v. Saul
Plaintiff: Terry McCormick
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00600
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/19/2019, as further set out in order. Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/9/2019. (cnw, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Northern District of Alabama; Case Number 4:19-cv-01045-ACA. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and certified docket sheet received ELECTRONICALLY via Email from the Clerk.(cnw, ) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct the docket text to reflect as Northern and not Southern. (cnw, ).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, entered by ALND, Because the period for bringing a civil action challenging the Commissioners decision has since expired, dismissal of this matter would effectively prevent Mr. McCormick from obtaining judicial review on the merits of his claims. Therefore, the court finds that the interest of justice would best be served by transferring this case to the Middle District ofAlabama. Accordingly, the court ORDERS that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/20/2019. (cnw, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION To Transfer United States Middle District of Alabama, Lee Division, filed in ALND, by Terry McCormick. (Allenstein, Myron). (cnw, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry McCormick, entered by ALND. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 7/23/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (cnw, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, by ALND. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (cnw, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, entered by ALND - Plaintiff has submitted a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Doc. #2 ). The court finds that Plaintiff is indigent, and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (doc. #2 ), is hereby GRANTED.Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/8/2019. (cnw, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed in ALND, by Terry McCormick. (cnw, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed in ALND, by Terry McCormick.(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormick v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry McCormick
Represented By: Myron Kay Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?