Maxwell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Angela D. Maxwell
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00689
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint, summons, and #3 order stamped by Social Security Administration for Andrew Saul, Commissioner served 9/30/2019. (dmn, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint, summons, and #3 order signed by Emily Sase for Attorney General of the United States, served 10/1/2019. (dmn, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint, summons, and #3 order signed by Niarches W. (name illegible) for Office of Regional Counsel served 9/30/2019. (dmn, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint, summons, #3 order signed by Lawrence Beamon for U. S. Attorney's Office served on 9/27/2019, Andrew Saul answer due 12/26/2019. (dmn, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued; summons, complaint, and #3 order mailed CMRRR to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General. (dmn, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plaintiff to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; defendant's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing. To consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge you should complete the attached form and return it to the Clerk of the Court within 21 days from the date of this order as further set out in the order. Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/25/2019. (dmn, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela D. Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(es, )
September 19, 2019 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Angela D. Maxwell.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 (TERMINATED DUE THE INCORRECT EVENT CODE) COUNTERCLAIM against Andrew Saul, filed by Angela D. Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(es, ) Modified on 9/23/2019 (kh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela D. Maxwell
Represented By: Walter Allen Blakeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?