U.S. Bank National Association v. McFerrin et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: The United States Department of Justice, David G. McFerrin and Barbara T. McFerrin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00696
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding Admission as to Attorney William Brennan Rutledge. (Attachments: #1 General Admission Form)(wcl, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due from The United States Department of Justice on 11/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/21/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by The United States Department of Justice. (Wadsworth, Stephen)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to and including 10/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 9/25/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response, to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the correct division. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF Document to Docket Entry #4 )(wcl, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by The United States Department of Justice. (Wadsworth, Stephen) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/25/2019) (wcl, ). Modified on 9/25/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the correct division (wcl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ).
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The United States Department of Justice. (wcl, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by The United States Department of Justice re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (wcl, )
September 19, 2019 COMPLAINT against Barbara T. McFerrin, David G. McFerrin, The United States Department of Justice, filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf)(wcl, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The United States Department of Justice from Circuit Court of Russell County, Alabama, case number 57-cv-19-900236.00. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. McFerrin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Stephen D Wadsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. McFerrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara T. McFerrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: William Brennan Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?