Tomelleri v. Lake Wedowee Real Estate et al
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Lake Wedowee Real Estate, Rhett Kirby, Brian Davidson and Tammy Sanders
Case Number: 3:2019cv01063
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Oliver P. Maguire. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 01/08/2020. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joseph R. Tomelleri re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Gannett-Malick, David)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Joseph R. Tomelleri; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice filing fee received re #2 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602056192. (amf, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice for Oliver P. Maguire by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gannett-Malick, David) Modified on 1/2/2020 to clarify the docket text (wcl, ).
December 19, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Davidson, Rhett Kirby, Lake Wedowee Real Estate, Tammy Sanders ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056081.), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Lake Wedowee Real Estate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Wedowee Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhett Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: David Eugene Gannett-Malick
Represented By: Oliver P. Maguire
Represented By: Morris Wade Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?