United States of America v. Mitchell et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dameisha Mitchell
Garnishee: Adient
Case Number: 3:2019mc03863
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Entry of Final Disposition Order; it is further ORDERED as follows: 1. Garnishee Adient US LLC shall withhold $50 biweekly from the Defendant's disposable earnings; 2. Garnishee shall promptly remit the identified nonexempt funds every month to the Clerk of the Court, One Church Street Suite B-110, Montgomery, Alabama 36104.; and 3. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to apply these funds to the restitution balance owed by the Defendant, Dameisha Mitchell; It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 3205(c)(10), this garnishment shall remain in effect until satisfaction of the debt owed to Plaintiff, until exhaustion of the property in the possession, custody, or control of the Garnishee in which the debtor has a substantial nonexempt interest, or by order of this court quashing the Writ of Garnishment, as further set out in order; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to administratively close this action subject to reopening for good cause shown; The administrative closure does not affect the validity of the continuing Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/26/2019. (kr, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Final Disposition Order by United States of America. (DuBois, James) Modified on 6/26/2019 to clarify docket text(kr, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (DuBois, James)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 6/20/2019, the United States shall file a status report that includes a motion for an appropriate disposition of this case. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/6/2019. (kr, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Adient. (kr, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment and #3 Writ of Garnishment, served on Adient on 5/15/19. (kr, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 US Marshals ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 5/9/2019 as to Dameisha Mitchell re #3 Writ of Garnishment, #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment. (cnw, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued and furnished to USMS for service. (cnw, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (cnw, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee form)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dameisha Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Adient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?