Corley v. Abbett et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Corley
Defendant: Geni Abernathy, Blake Jennings, Brandi Meadows, Annette Trap and Jimmy Abbett
Case Number: 3:2020cv00042
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Timothy Corley re #12 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Wooten, James) Modified on 3/13/2020 to add the link to the #12 Notice (amf, ).
March 13, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anderson Radney on behalf of Jimmy Abbett, Blake Jennings (Radney, Thomas)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING the #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint; On or before 3/16/2020, the Parties shall file their joint stipulation for dismissal or Defendant shall file an answer or responsive pleading. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/14/2020. (am, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Timothy Corley; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jimmy Abbett, Geni Abernathy, Blake Jennings, Brandi Meadows, & Annette Trap. (amf, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Annette Trap. (McNeill, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Brandi Meadows. (McNeill, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Blake Jennings. (McNeill, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Geni Abernathy. (McNeill, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Abbett. (McNeill, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Jimmy Abbett, Geni Abernathy, Blake Jennings, Brandi Meadows, Annette Trap. (McNeill, James)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Timothy Corley; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, ) Modified on 1/22/2020 to show the correct file date (am, ).
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Timothy Corley. (am, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jimmy Abbett, Geni Abernathy, Blake Jennings, Brandi Meadows, Annette Trap and returned to counsel for personal service. (am, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jimmy Abbett, Geni Abernathy, Blake Jennings, Brandi Meadows, Annette Trap, filed by Timothy Corley. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602056368.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, )
January 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Timothy Corley. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corley v. Abbett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geni Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Trap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Abbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Corley
Represented By: James Marion Wooten
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?