Shaw v. Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff: James Shaw, Jr.
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00199
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Robinett, Matthew)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file an Answer is GRANTED. The deadline is extended from 4/20/2020 to 5/11/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 4/21/2020. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC. (Robinett, Matthew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinett, Matthew) Modified on 4/21/2020 to include "unopposed." (dmn, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
March 20, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James Shaw, Jr. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Shaw, Jr. (kh, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trans Union, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057375.), filed by James Shaw, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shaw, Jr.
Represented By: Micah Stephen Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Whittle Robinett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?