Pfeifer v. Smith et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Deryke M. Pfeifer, Sr.
Defendant: Dominik Thomas and Stuart K. Smith
Case Number: 3:2020cv00282
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to defer service of process on the defendant(s) until further order of the court, following the court's 1915A(a) review of the plaintiff's complaint, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 6/5/2020. (am, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case is REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/2/2020. (am, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #5 motion for slander and defamation is STRICKEN from the docket as it is a duplication of the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/2/2020. (am, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received re #2 Order: $400.00, receipt number 4602058041. (bes, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #6 ORDER) MOTION of Slander and Defamation of Character by Deryke M. Pfeifer, Sr. (bes, ) Modified on 6/2/2020 (am, ).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION denying #1 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/4/2020. (bes, )
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 5/19/2020 the plf shall file either the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by an account statement from the inmate account clerk at the Lee County Detention Center showing the average monthly balance in the plf's jail account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of this civil action and the average monthly deposits to the plf's account during the past six months or, if he does not seek in forma pauperis treatment, the $400 filing/administrative fees; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this court; DIRECTING the Clerk to to provide a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/4/2020. (bes, )
April 29, 2020 COMPLAINT against Stuart K. Smith, Dominik Thomas, filed by Deryke M. Pfeifer, Sr. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF, erroneously docketed as Inmate 1983 Complaint) (bes, )
April 29, 2020 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Deryke M. Pfeifer, Sr. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Stuart K. Smith, Dominik Thomas, filed by Deryke M. Pfeifer, Sr. (NO FILING FEE; NO IFP)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfeifer v. Smith et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deryke M. Pfeifer, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominik Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?