Nadeau v. Landstar Inway, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Guy Nadeau
Defendant: Marcos J. Cardoso, Landstar Inway, Inc. and Kordylia Transport, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00718
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/23/2020. (amf, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Marcos J. Cardoso re #9 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Arnwine, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Guy Nadeau. (Overby, Charles)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Marcos J. Cardoso; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kordylia Transport, LLC re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Arnwine, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; DIRECTING the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/28/2020. (amf, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Defendants Marcos J. Cardoso & Kordylia Transport, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendants Marcos J. Cardoso & Kordylia Transport, LLC. (amf, )
September 24, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #4 ANSWER - Attorney Thomas Lee Oliver, II for Defendants Marcos J. Cardoso & Kordylia Transport, LLC added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Marcos J. Cardoso, Kordylia Transport, LLC.(Arnwine, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Guy Nadeau & Defendant Landstar Inway, Inc..(amf, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint by Landstar Inway, Inc..(Arnwine, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Landstar Inway, Inc.. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 - 5 for PDF) (amf, )
September 9, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Landstar Inway, Inc. re #2 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 - 4 for PDF) (amf, )
September 9, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Guy Nadeau. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 - 1 for PDF) (amf, )
September 9, 2020 COMPLAINT against Marcos J. Cardoso, Kordylia Transport, LLC, Landstar Inway, Inc., filed by Guy Nadeau. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #2 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Landstar Inway, Inc. from Circuit Court of Russell County, AL, case number 57-CV-2020-900185.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602059367) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Case Action Summary, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit D - Landstar Inway, Inc's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nadeau v. Landstar Inway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos J. Cardoso
Represented By: Robert Arthur Arnwine, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landstar Inway, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Arnwine, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kordylia Transport, LLC
Represented By: Robert Arthur Arnwine, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Nadeau
Represented By: Gary Oman Bruce
Represented By: Charles Frederick Overby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?